MA H1427 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to affordable housing units. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to affordable housing units

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-18JointHearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S882 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H2013 (Similar To) 2021-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S895 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Senate concurred
S868 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - House concurred
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback