MA H1426 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4184
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to juvenile life sentences. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to juvenile life sentences
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4184 |
2014-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4184 (Replaced by) 2014-07-16 - See H4307
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1426 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1426.pdf |