MA H1402 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing support services to juvenile offenders and at-risk youth and their families to reduce the risk of offending or re-offending. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to community support for at-risk youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H120 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
H1606 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H176 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2362 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H545 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H120 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
H1606 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H176 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2362 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H545 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1402 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1402.pdf |