MA H1399 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to controlling and abusive litigation. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to controlling and abusive litigation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1079 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
H1431 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1132 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S1052 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
H1431 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1132 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S1052 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1399 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1399.pdf |