MA H1386 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a penalty for the sale of tattooing, branding or body piercing devices to unlicensed body art practitioners or minors. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to selling tattooing, branding, body piercing kit or device to an unlicensed body art practitioner or minor
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2552 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1386 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1386.pdf |