MA S2552 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting inhumane feline declawing
Title
Prohibiting inhumane feline declawing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #107 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #107 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read third |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Substituted for S190 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S190 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S190 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2552
S90 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H198
H198 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S533 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S90 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H198
H198 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S533 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2552 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2552.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/193/SenateRollCall107.pdf |