MA H1379 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase housing development. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote Yes in My Back Yard

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-15HouseHouse concurred
2024-07-11SenateAmendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
2024-07-11SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-16HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-05SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-04HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-04HouseNo further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-07-12JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S2088 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - House concurred
H4097 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2024
H4238 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4822
H4822 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback