MA H1357 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4218

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the use of information derived from unmanned aerial vehicles as evidence in judicial, regulatory or other government proceedings. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate the use of unmanned aerial vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4218
2014-04-03SenateSenate concurred
2014-03-20HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
2013-07-09JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4218 (Replaced by) 2014-07-03 - Reported, in part, by H1590

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback