MA H1355 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize state universities to offer clinical and professional doctorate programs. Higher Education.
Title
To authorize state universities to offer clinical and professional doctorate programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1929 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1620 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1929 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1620 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1355 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1355.pdf |