MA H1323 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require higher educational institutions to provide certain information to students applying for or changing their major field of study. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting educational awareness and opportunity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H2875 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2931 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S921 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4505
H180 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1220 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4505
S66 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S836 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1791 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback