MA H1308 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the concealment of the death of children and the penalties for the sale or purchase of minor children. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the concealment of the death of children and the penalties for the sale or purchase of minor children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-08-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-08-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-07-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-06-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012 |
2011-05-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2011 from 01:00 PM-10:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1308 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11563&generalCourtId=1 |