MA H1297 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4975
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expedite the permitting process for housing. Housing.
Title
Streamlining permitting for housing
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4975 |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1281 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H3998 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2019
H1327 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4975 (Replaced by) 2020-09-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H3998 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2019
H1327 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4975 (Replaced by) 2020-09-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1297 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1297.pdf |