MA H1260 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to committing to higher education the resources to insure a strong and healthy public higher education system. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Committing to higher education the resources to insure a strong and healthy public higher education system

Sponsors

Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]
Rep. Manny Cruz [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Rodney Elliott [D]
Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Samantha Montano [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D]Rep. Ryan Hamilton [D]
Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Carol Doherty [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Christopher Worrell [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. Simon Cataldo [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Christopher Flanagan [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Adrianne Ramos [D]Rep. David DeCoste [R]Rep. Orlando Ramos [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D]
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Estela Reyes [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Jennifer Balinsky Armini [D]
Rep. James Murphy [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Shirley Arriaga [D]Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]
Rep. Aaron Saunders [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Ted Philips [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-08JointHearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S816 (Similar To) 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3438 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Senate concurred
H3847 (Similar To) 2023-05-15 - Senate concurred
S2437 (Similar To) 2023-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback