MA H1223 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to requiring sexual harassment training at institutions of higher education. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring sexual harassment training at institutions of higher education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19JointHearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S2183 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S1724 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S759 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S761 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S768 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S1472 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback