MA H1199 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4682
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow restaurants to donate edible leftover cooked food and nonperishable food to local food pantries and assistance shelters. Public Health.
Title
Relative to food donations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4682 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday June 30, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S848 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1272 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H1166 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2438 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2431 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3468 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1157 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4682 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1272 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H1166 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2438 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2431 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3468 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1157 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4682 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1199 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1199.pdf |