MA H1194 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-14 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-14 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment by the Executive Office of Health and Human Services of a MassHealth reimbursement of school-based care task force to study and make recommendations of direct MassHealth reimbursements to local education authorities for certain school-based services. Health Care Financing.
Title
Resolve relative to the reimbursement of school-based care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S499 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H991 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
H4295 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Hearing scheduled for 02/15/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4306 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
H991 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
H4295 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Hearing scheduled for 02/15/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4306 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1194 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1194.pdf |