MA H1186 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to oversight of the market by the Health Policy Commission and the Center for Health Information and Analysis. Health Care Financing.
Title
Strengthening HPC and CHIA market oversight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1146 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1966 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1894 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H611 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Senate concurred
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S822 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1371 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1973 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H1146 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1966 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1894 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H611 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Senate concurred
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S822 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1371 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1973 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1186.pdf |