MA H1170 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Peisch of Wellesley, a petition of Alice Hanlon Peisch that the Attorney General promulgate regulations to create a standard disclosure form for residential real estate sales. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to real estate disclosure forms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4976 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1170 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1170.pdf |