MA H1167 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish uniform confidentiality and enforcement provisions relative to certain licensees under the jurisdiction of the Division of Banks. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing uniform enforcement and confidentiality provisions relative to certain licensees under the jurisdiction of The Division of Banks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1131 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H2040 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H2040 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1167 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1167.pdf |