MA H2040 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5023
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the confidentiality of communications of information of labor organizations. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the confidentiality of communications of information of labor organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5023 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1131 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
S1128 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1821
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1128 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1821
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2040 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2040.pdf |