MA H1142 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4682
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the practice of athletic training. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the practice of athletic training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4682 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday June 30, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1263 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S916 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H650 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H932 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4682 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S916 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H650 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H932 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4682 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1142 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1142.pdf |