MA H1141 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to foreclosures in the historic districts of the Commonwealth. Housing.
Title
Relative to reducing damage caused by the current foreclosure crisis in the historic districts of Massachusetts
Sponsors
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] | Rep. Gloria Fox [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4209 |
2015-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4209 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1141 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1141.pdf |