MA H114 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing consumers with protections from vendors providing retail sales or services in spaces other than fixed building sites. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing security to consumers for purchases from certain vendors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4400 |
2011-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4400 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H114 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8574&generalCourtId=1 |