MA H1135 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating individual or group health insurance policies providing prescription drug coverage. Financial Services.
Title
To help patients and reduce health care costs by ensuring patient adherence to medications
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1135 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1135.pdf |