MA H1110 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4975
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the right of health care consumers to receive treatment of mental health conditions from providers of their choice. Financial Services.
Title
To extend coverage for any willing provider to qualify as a mental health professional
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4975 |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1868 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1307 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H4975 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1868 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1307 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H4975 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1110 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1110.pdf |