MA H1109 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide insurance benefits for expenses incurred when adopting children. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to paid parental leave for child adoption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2312 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1093 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
S562 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1643 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1648 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2222 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2355 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1093 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
S562 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1643 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1648 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2222 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2355 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1109 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1109.pdf |