MA H1098 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative the elimination of nursing home fees. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative the elimination of nursing home fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2089 |
2011-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Elder Affairs. |
2011-01-20 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2089 (Replaced by) 2011-12-08 - Discharged to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1098 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H01098 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13295&generalCourtId=1 |