MA H1091 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4590

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to municipal planning board regulations governing the reconstruction of certain local roadways. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing impervious surfaces

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4590
2017-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1977 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
H1890 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3427 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H3798 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3901
H913 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H808 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1806 (Similar To) 2017-08-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1867 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3534 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1816 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1871 (Similar To) 2017-12-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4100
H3815 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3963
H4022 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted, see H4713
H4590 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4912 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback