MA H3798 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3901
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3901
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain road in the town of Charlton as the Trooper Thomas L. Clardy way. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain road as Trooper Thomas L. Clardy Way
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3901 |
2017-09-13 | House | Read third |
2017-08-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-08-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-08-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-08-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-06-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1091 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S1535 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
S1977 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
H1890 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3427 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H913 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H808 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1806 (Similar To) 2017-08-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1816 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H4912 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2018
S1535 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
S1977 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
H1890 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3427 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H913 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H808 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1806 (Similar To) 2017-08-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1816 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H4912 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3798 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3798.pdf |