MA H1871 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the safety or emergency vehicle “move over law”, so-called. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the move over law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4100 |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1880 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1806 (Similar To) 2017-08-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H913 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1816 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H808 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2748 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4100 (Replaced by) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4912 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2018
H1806 (Similar To) 2017-08-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H913 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1816 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H808 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2748 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4100 (Replaced by) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4912 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1871 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1871.pdf |