MA H1087 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to handicapped parking spaces regulated by cities and towns. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To ensure adequate handicapped parking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1646 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
S2178 (Similar To) 2017-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2017
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1646 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
S2178 (Similar To) 2017-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1087 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1087.pdf |