MA H1085 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regional stabilization funds. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to regional stabilization funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1483 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1646 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1621 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1551 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1137 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3825 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1646 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1621 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1551 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1137 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3825 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1085 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1085.pdf |