MA H1062 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4705

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the disclosure of information of certain persons in the unclaimed property program. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect taxpayer confidentiality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4705
2023-06-12JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-06-12JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
2023-06-08JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2736 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2755 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2757 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4705 (Replaced by) 2024-06-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4798 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Adopted, in concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback