MA H1006 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5041

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the impact of proposed rules and regulations on commercial agricultural operations. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting the viability of farms in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-29HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5041
2021-10-27JointHearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S1400 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - House concurred
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
H5041 (Replaced by) 2022-08-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback