LA SR66 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Animal Welfare Commission to study the necessity of the seven-day notice requirement provided to governing authorities before inspecting animal impoundment facilities.
Title
Requests the Louisiana Animal Welfare Commission to study the necessity of the seven-day notice requirement provided to governing authorities before inspecting animal impoundment facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. A.G. Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |