LA SR59 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Regents to study the feasibility of requiring the state's public colleges and universities to use the Common Application as part of the admission process.
Title
Requests the Board of Regents to study the feasibility of requiring the state's public colleges and universities to use the Common Application as part of the admission process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |