LA SR42 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Mary Bird Perkins Cancer Center for hosting "Fest for Life" which provides free cancer screenings, as a minority cancer awareness event, on April 16, 2016.
Title
Commends Mary Bird Perkins Cancer Center for hosting "Fest for Life" which provides free cancer screenings, as a minority cancer awareness event, on April 16, 2016.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |