LA SR20 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the 120th anniversary of the landmark United States Supreme Court Plessy v. Ferguson decision, and encourages President Barack Obama to bestow the Presidential Medal of Freedom posthumously upon Homer Adolph Plessy.
Title
Recognizes the 120th anniversary of the landmark United States Supreme Court Plessy v. Ferguson decision, and encourages President Barack Obama to bestow the Presidential Medal of Freedom posthumously upon Homer Adolph Plessy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24/2016. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |