LA SR18 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Dr. Angela Keyes upon being named Psychology Educator of the Year at Tulane University School of Medicine.
Title
Commends Dr. Angela Keyes upon being named Psychology Educator of the Year at Tulane University School of Medicine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24/2016. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |