LA SR106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to study the utilization of multimodal assets, specifically ports and rails by Louisiana local businesses.
Title
Creates a task force to study the utilization of multimodal assets, specifically ports and rails by Louisiana local businesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |