LA SCR66 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 104.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes within the Department of Insurance an advisory work group to examine methods to allow an insured under a life insurance policy or the contract holder of an annuity to convert the policy or annuity to a long term care benefit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes within the Department of Insurance an advisory work group to examine methods to allow an insured under a life insurance policy or the contract holder of an annuity to convert the policy or annuity to a long term care benefit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-10 Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 104.
2012-05-09 Reported by substitute.
2012-04-24 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2012-04-23 Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback