LA SCR53 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners to place on its official website a link to information regarding end of life care in the state of Louisiana.
Title
Requests the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners to place on its official website a link to information regarding end of life care in the state of Louisiana.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - House - House Vote on SCR 53 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1006) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 53 ADOPT (#349) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 53 ADOPT (#349) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-19 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 85 yeas, 0 nays. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-14 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |