LA SCR26 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Thursday, April 25, 2019, as Junior League Day at the state capitol and commends the Junior League for its contributions to the state of Louisiana.
Title
Recognizes Thursday, April 25, 2019, as Junior League Day at the state capitol and commends the Junior League for its contributions to the state of Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 26 SCR 26 BY PEACOCK (#27) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019. |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |