LA SCR14 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 2013 as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month and memorialize Congress to enact legislation to provide additional funding for research in order to find a treatment and cure for amyotrophic lateral sclerosis.
Title
Recognizes May 2013 as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month and memorialize Congress to enact legislation to provide additional funding for research in order to find a treatment and cure for amyotrophic lateral sclerosis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14, ADOPT (#42) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013. |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |