LA SCR14 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Chief Judge Joan Bernard Armstrong on her retirement from the Louisiana State Court of Appeal Fourth Circuit and for 37 years of dedicated service to Louisiana's judicial system.
Title
Commends Chief Judge Joan Bernard Armstrong on her retirement from the Louisiana State Court of Appeal Fourth Circuit and for 37 years of dedicated service to Louisiana's judicial system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14, ADOPT (#14) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-03-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-03-20 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-03-19 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-03-14 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2012-03-13 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-03-13 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-03-12 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |