LA SCR114 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Senate Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs and the House Committee on House and Governmental Affairs to study the issues relative to the merger of one or more state departments.
Title
Requests the Senate Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs and the House Committee on House and Governmental Affairs to study the issues relative to the merger of one or more state departments.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Amedee [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on SCR 114 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#899) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 114 ADOPT (#785) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 114 ADOPT (#785) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-06-05 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |