LA SCR102 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a task force to study and make recommendations relative to the authority for and use of the design-build method for contracts by public entities.
Title
Establishes a task force to study and make recommendations relative to the authority for and use of the design-build method for contracts by public entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on SCR 102 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#813) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 102 ADOPT (#543) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 102 ADOPT (#543) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 1 nays. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-29 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |