LA SB88 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the workers' compensation medical treatment schedule. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the workers' compensation medical treatment schedule. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 88 CONCUR (#602) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 88 FINAL PASSAGE (#672) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 88 FINAL PASSAGE (#295) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 8/1/2019.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 345.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-30SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays.
2019-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-16HouseReported with amendments (9-5). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2019-05-08HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-08SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-07SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB88&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119520
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130417
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139759
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144286
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134616
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135051
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139359
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119521
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132181
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135053
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132711
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139304
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139687

Bill Comments

feedback