LA SB83 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for certain change orders when certain unit prices are contained in the initial contract. (8/1/23)
Title
Provides for certain change orders when certain unit prices are contained in the initial contract. (8/1/23)
Sponsors
Sen. Glen Womack [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 83 ADOPT (#986) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 83 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1188) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 83 REJECT (#518) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#711) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 83 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1188) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 83 REJECT (#518) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#711) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2023. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 329. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 88, nays 3. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2023-06-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2023. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2023-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2023-06-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Gadberry, Wright, and Coussan. |
2023-05-30 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Womack, McMath, and Morris. |
2023-05-30 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2023-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023. |
2023-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |