LA SB53 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the powers and authority of the commission of the Cane River Waterway District. (8/1/23)
Title
Provides for the powers and authority of the commission of the Cane River Waterway District. (8/1/23)
Sponsors
Sen. Louie Bernard [R] | Rep. Gabe Firment [R] | Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R] | Rep. Foy Gadberry [R] |
Rep. Cedric Glover [D] | Rep. Ed Larvadain [D] | Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 53 FINAL PASSAGE (#691) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 53 FINAL PASSAGE (#117) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 53 FINAL PASSAGE (#117) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2023. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2023-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023. |
2023-05-11 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |